Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 294 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14337 Week
» 79291 Month
» 281955 Year
» 3308808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
109 |
m/e |
05/1909 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12521 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52521 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
27 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 05/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/05/1957 |
Service Life |
48 yrs , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
25F |
Low Moor |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 109 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12521 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52521 |
|
|
27/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
24/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52521 |
|
|
08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|