Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 463 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14506 Week
» 79460 Month
» 282124 Year
» 3308977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
642 |
m/e |
07/1909 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12524 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52524 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
27 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 07/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/08/1954 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/08/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 642 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12524 |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52524 |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52524 |
|
|