Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 707 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1603 Week
» 20074 Month
» 155739 Year
» 666841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1053   09/1890
LMS 12561 y/e 1924
BR 52561 y/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal During 02/1955
Service Life 64 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25F Low Moor 4w/e 17/07/1951
25C Goole 4w/e 12/07/1952
25F Low Moor 4w/e 04/10/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 07/07/1951
LOAN 25C Goole 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   w/e 05/02/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1053
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12561    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52561    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
02/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 52561    

prev prev