Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 16 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5622 Week
» 15757 Month
» 331988 Year
» 843090 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 890   07/1906
LMS 12576 y/e 1924
BR 52576 y/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 07/1906
Withdrawal During 02/1957
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 05/11/1955
25D Mirfield m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   22/02/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1906 To Service To service as LYR Number 890
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12576    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52576    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52576    

prev prev