Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 61 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 6517 Week
» 23833 Month
» 282692 Year
» 793794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 342   11/1896
LMS 12579 y/e 1924
BR 52579 y/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 11/1896
Withdrawal During 10/1952
Service Life 55 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 24/02/1951
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 17/07/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 23C Lancaster Green Ayre m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 14/07/1951
WDN   w/e 04/10/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1896 To Service To service as LYR Number 342
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12579    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52579    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
10/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 52579    

prev prev