Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 722 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1684 Week
» 18484 Month
» 334715 Year
» 845817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 367   10/1889
LMS 12580 y/e 1924
BR 52580 y/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1889
Withdrawal During 02/1954
Service Life 64 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24B Rose Grove 8w/e 29/11/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   w/e 10/02/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1889 To Service To service as LYR Number 367
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12580    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52580    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
02/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 52580    

prev prev