Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 703 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1599 Week
» 20070 Month
» 155735 Year
» 666837 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 252   10/1889
LMS 12588 y/e 1924
BR 52588 y/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1889
Withdrawal During 09/1952
Service Life 62 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23C Southport 4w/e 22/06/1946
23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
28B Fleetwood 2w/e 17/06/1950
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 19/05/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 28B Fleetwood w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 27/10/1951
WDN   w/e 06/09/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1889 To Service To service as LYR Number 252
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12588    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52588    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
09/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 52588    

prev prev