Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 145 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 1218 Week
» 20544 Month
» 247305 Year
» 758407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 446   12/1889
LMS 12592 y/e 1924
BR 52592 y/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1889
Withdrawal During 08/1954
Service Life 64 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25C Goole 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 24/02/1951
25D Mirfield 4w/e 23/02/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   07/08/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1889 To Service To service as LYR Number 446
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12592    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52592    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 52592    

prev prev