Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 54 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 54 Week
» 8796 Month
» 352975 Year
» 864077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 320   12/1894
LMS 12615 y/e 1924
BR 52615 y/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal During 06/1953
Service Life 58 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/12/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/12/1951
WDN   w/e 27/06/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as LYR Number 320
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12615    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52615    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
06/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52615    

prev