Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 366 Today
» 1151 Yesterday
» 2588 Week
» 19239 Month
» 213083 Year
» 724185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 887   08/1909
LMS 12619 y/e 1924
BR 52619 y/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hughes
Class 28
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 08/1909
Withdrawal During 12/1953
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10B Preston 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6K Rhyl 8w/e 14/06/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 85C Hereford w/e 15/12/1951
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 14/06/1952
WDN   w/e 12/12/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1909 To Service To service as LYR Number 887
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12619    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52619    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
12/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52619    

prev