Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 724 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1686 Week
» 18486 Month
» 334717 Year
» 845819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1043   07/1890
LMS 10640 y/e 1924
BR 50640 y/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 07/1890
Withdrawal During 04/1952
Service Life 61 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24F Fleetwood 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27C Southport 4w/e 17/07/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 30/06/1951
WDN   w/e 19/04/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1043
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10640    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50640    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
04/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 50640    

prev prev