Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6963 Week
» 27926 Month
» 64679 Year
» 575781 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1047   08/1890
LMS 10644 y/e 1924
BR 50644 y/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 08/1890
Withdrawal During 10/1958
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 68 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
11B Barrow in Furness 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B Preston 4w/e 12/07/1952
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 19/07/1947
LOAN 10D Plodder Lane w/e 25/02/1950
LOAN 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 08/04/1950
LOAN 10D Plodder Lane w/e 29/04/1950
ALLOC 10D Plodder Lane w/e 03/06/1950
LOAN 10B Preston 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 10B Preston 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   w/e 25/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1047
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10644    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50644    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50644    

prev prev