Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 708 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1604 Week
» 20075 Month
» 155740 Year
» 666842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1049   08/1890
LMS 10646 y/e 1924
BR 50646 y/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 5
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 08/1890
Withdrawal During 11/1958
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 68 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26C Bolton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B Aintree 4w/e 27/01/1951
26C Bolton 4w/e 24/03/1951
20C Royston 4w/e 09/10/1954
15D Bedford 4w/e 25/02/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 10/03/1951
LOAN 20C Royston 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 20C Royston 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 15D Bedford 4w/e 25/02/1956
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   w/e 08/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1049
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10646    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50646    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50646    

prev prev