|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1894 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 1336 Built at Dübs & Co |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) | ||
17/03/1952 | To Store | To Store | ||
24/03/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1336 | ||
22/05/1954 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |