Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1787 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15193 Week
» 68209 Month
» 187736 Year
» 3214589 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D122 |
11/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45070 |
01/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
11/10/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
29/01/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
27/05/1989 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
04/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1973 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D122 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45070 |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
29/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45070 |
|
|
27/05/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|