Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2564 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15970 Week
» 68986 Month
» 188513 Year
» 3215366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
35 |
m/e |
07/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
R |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
To Service |
During 07/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/11/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
552,473 |
Information |
Despatched to Worcester MPD to provide steam as stationary boiler, 17/1/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FDL |
Ferndale |
4w/e |
21/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/02/1958 |
Rhymney Railway 0-6-2T No. 35 |
RR No. 35, withdrawn November, 1956, and latterly used as stationary boiler at Worcester Works was on Swindon dump on 16th February last. |
SLS/195803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 35 Built at Hudswell Clarke |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
12/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35 |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|