Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1680 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19483 Week
» 72499 Month
» 192026 Year
» 3218879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Rhymney Railway |
110 |
m/e |
08/1904 |
Great Western Railway |
51 |
y/e |
1923 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Jenkins |
Class |
M |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 08/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/10/1948 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
689,280 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 25/12/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1904 |
CED |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/10/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/11/1964 |
Crewe North MPD (Stored) |
Ex-Works: D208, D380, D1631/2, 42546, 46491 44803, 70033, 78023; Stored: 45552/4/6, 45617/72/6, 45704, 46228/35/9/40/5/8,51/4/6, 71000. Also on shed: D1585, D1697, D1744, 5056. |
SLS/196412 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Rhymney Railway Number 110 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
25/10/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|