Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2075 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19878 Week
» 72894 Month
» 192421 Year
» 3219274 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
57 |
m/e |
04/1911 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
A |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
To Service |
During 04/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/04/1952 |
Service Life |
41 yrs , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BRY |
Barry |
4w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 57 Built at Hudswell Clarke |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
31/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
29/04/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57 |
|
|