Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 292 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 292 Week
» 19618 Month
» 246379 Year
» 757481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 58   05/1911

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hurry Riches
Class A
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hudswell Clarke
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal During 09/1954
Service Life 43 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 30/09/1951
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC AYN Abercynon m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC THT Treherbert m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   m/e 30/09/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as GWR Number 58
Built at Hudswell Clarke
   
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
09/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58    

prev prev