Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
65 |
m/e |
08/1914 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
A1 |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
To Service |
During 08/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/02/1954 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Total Mileage |
580,696 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1914 |
ABDR |
|
Aberdare |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88B |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/02/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 65 Built at Hudswell Clarke |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
01/02/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65 |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|