Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 293 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 293 Week
» 19619 Month
» 246380 Year
» 757482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 66   03/1916

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hurry Riches
Class A1
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hudswell Clarke
To Service During 03/1916
Withdrawal During 07/1955
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/01/1951
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   m/e 31/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1916 To Service To service as GWR Number 66
Built at Hudswell Clarke
   
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 66    

prev prev