Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 289 Today
» 956 Yesterday
» 4214 Week
» 20412 Month
» 185312 Year
» 696414 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 78   08/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hurry Riches
Class AP
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hudswell Clarke
To Service During 08/1921
Withdrawal During 08/1955
Service Life 34 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 04/12/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 04/12/1954
WDN   m/e 31/08/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1921 To Service To service as GWR Number 78
Built at Hudswell Clarke
   
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
08/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 78    

prev