Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3525 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17568 Week
» 82522 Month
» 285186 Year
» 3312039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
80 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
AP |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/02/1954 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Total Mileage |
760,629 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1921 |
RHY |
|
Rhymney |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
RHY |
|
Rhymney |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88A |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
25/11/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/02/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 80 Built at Hudswell Clarke |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
01/02/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80 |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|