Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 292 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 292 Week
» 19618 Month
» 246379 Year
» 757481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 83   08/1909

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hurry Riches
Class P
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
To Service During 08/1909
Withdrawal During 05/1955
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 20/05/1950
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1909 To Service To service as GWR Number 83    
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 83    

prev