Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2213 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15619 Week
» 68635 Month
» 188162 Year
» 3215015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7184 |
m/e |
01/1932 |
British Railways |
47184 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Sentinel |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Sentinel |
To Service |
During 01/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/12/1955 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7184 Built at Sentinel |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47184 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47184 |
|
|
01/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|