Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 279 m/e 07/1910

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal During 05/1954
Service Life 43 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88F Treherbert 4w/e 30/09/1951
88F Treherbert 4w/e 24/01/1953
88E Abercynon 4w/e 21/03/1953
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FDL Ferndale 4w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as GWR Number 279
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
05/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 279    

prev prev