Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 383 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1768 Week
» 8573 Month
» 115519 Year
» 1337084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 285 m/e 04/1907

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Manning, Wardle & Co.
To Service During 04/1907
Withdrawal During 08/1953
Service Life 46 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   m/e 31/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1907 To Service To service as GWR Number 285
Built at Manning, Wardle & Co.
   
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 285    

prev prev