Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 297 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 297 Week
» 34872 Month
» 104351 Year
» 1325916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 411 m/e 02/1921
GWR 401 y/e 1924
GWR 303 m/e 31/01/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorne Leslie
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Sat 05/05/1956
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
   Withdrawn 05/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as TVR Number 411
Built at Hawthorne Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 401    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 303    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
05/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 303    

prev