Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 785 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 5051 Week
» 16829 Month
» 306221 Year
» 817323 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 11   12/1914
GWR 343 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorne Leslie
To Service During 12/1914
Withdrawal Wed 05/10/1955
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CVCYS   8w/e 23/03/1946
   Withdrawn 05/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/03/1946
WDN   m/e 31/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1914 To Service To service as TVR Number 11
Built at Hawthorne Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 343    
23/03/1946 Allocation      
05/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 343    

prev prev