Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2064 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19867 Week
» 72883 Month
» 192410 Year
» 3219263 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
12 |
m/e |
12/1914 |
Great Western Railway |
344 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 12/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/11/1952 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Barry Works |
On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 12 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 344 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dowlais Central (rhy) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
18/11/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 344 |
|
|