Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2670 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16076 Week
» 69092 Month
» 188619 Year
» 3215472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
20 |
m/e |
05/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
345 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 05/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 22/09/1955 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys |
Total Mileage |
771,837 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1920 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/09/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
21/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 20 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 345 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
22/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 345 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|