Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1464 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19267 Week
» 72283 Month
» 191810 Year
» 3218663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
45 |
m/e |
08/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
346 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
To Service |
During 08/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/10/1955 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Total Mileage |
834,772 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
4w/e Sat 31/12/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1915 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 45 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 346 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
05/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 346 |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|