Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14235 Week
» 67251 Month
» 186778 Year
» 3213631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
75 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
347 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 04/12/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs , 4 dys |
Total Mileage |
763,357 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1921 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/12/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 75 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 347 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
04/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 347 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|