Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 80 m/e 12/1921
GWR 348 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal Sat 05/05/1956
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 05/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
WDN   m/e 31/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as TVR Number 80
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 348    
05/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 348    

prev prev