Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 251 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 251 Week
» 34826 Month
» 104305 Year
» 1325870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 124 m/e 08/1915
GWR 357 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 08/1915
Withdrawal Mon 02/01/1956
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 24/01/1953
   Withdrawn 02/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   m/e 31/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1915 To Service To service as TVR Number 124
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 357    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
02/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 357    

prev prev