Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 881 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14287 Week
» 67303 Month
» 186830 Year
» 3213683 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
133 |
m/e |
02/1919 |
Great Western Railway |
367 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Nasmyth Wilson |
To Service |
During 02/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 23/03/1956 (Defective cylinder block) |
Withdrawal Notes |
Defective cylinder block |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Total Mileage |
758,406 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1919 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/03/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
27/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 133 Built at Nasmyth Wilson |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 367 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
23/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 367 |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|