Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2287 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20090 Week
» 73106 Month
» 192633 Year
» 3219486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
135 |
m/e |
02/1919 |
Great Western Railway |
370 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Nasmyth Wilson |
To Service |
During 02/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/08/1957 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
618,242 |
Information |
Mileage since rebuild in 1925 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1919 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/08/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
4w/e |
12/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
4w/e |
09/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 135 Built at Nasmyth Wilson |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 370 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
13/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 370 |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|