Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3531 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16937 Week
» 69953 Month
» 189480 Year
» 3216333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
402 |
m/e |
08/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
388 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 08/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/10/1956 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 2 mths , 0 dys |
Total Mileage |
782,915 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
4w/e |
29/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 402 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 388 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
01/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 388 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|