Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16029 Week
» 69045 Month
» 188572 Year
» 3215425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
403 |
m/e |
09/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
389 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 09/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 20/01/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
Total Mileage |
762,250 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
4w/e Sat 08/09/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1920 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88B |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/01/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 403 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 389 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
20/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 389 |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|