Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 27 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17830 Week
» 70846 Month
» 190373 Year
» 3217226 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
409 |
m/e |
01/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
398 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 01/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/08/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
623,646 |
Information |
Mileage since rebuild in 1925 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1921 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/08/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
4w/e |
04/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 409 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 398 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
13/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 398 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|