Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
410 |
m/e |
01/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
399 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 01/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/09/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
Total Mileage |
695,970 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
23/09/1956 |
Swindon Works |
On Works were noted the following : 92089, complete, no shed plate; 92088, 92090, almost complete, numbers chalked on; 6848 'Toddington Grange' painted green and lined out; 6029 just out, without double chimney; 316, 382, 399 being groken up. |
SLS/195611 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 410 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 399 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
03/09/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 399 |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|