Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 98 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19009 Week
» 83963 Month
» 286627 Year
» 3313480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
412 |
m/e |
02/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
402 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway (1947) |
304 |
on |
10/03/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 02/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/08/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Total Mileage |
661,941 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1921 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/08/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 412 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 402 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
10/03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 304 |
|
|
12/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 304 |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|