Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
52 |
m/e |
08/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
440 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway (1947) |
316 |
on |
15/06/1950 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
To Service |
During 08/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/07/1956 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Total Mileage |
828,608 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
on |
14/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
4w/e |
12/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
23/09/1956 |
Swindon Works |
On Works were noted the following : 92089, complete, no shed plate; 92088, 92090, almost complete, numbers chalked on; 6848 'Toddington Grange' painted green and lined out; 6029 just out, without double chimney; 316, 382, 399 being groken up. |
SLS/195611 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 52 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 440 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
15/06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 316 |
|
|
12/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
23/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 316 |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|