Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 60 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 60 Week
» 14317 Month
» 242201 Year
» 1463766 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 823 m/e 09/1902

Locomotive Specifics
Class W_L
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
W_L09/1902
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 09/1902
Withdrawal During 07/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1902
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. SLS/194802
29/02/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender SLS/194804
07/09/1958 Oswestry Works In the Works on 7th September-822 an 823 (stored), and 1503, 4602, 6646, 46515 (under repair). At the shed, the standard 75xxx have been exchanged for Manors from Chester. SLS/195810
23/04/1961 Oswestry Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 822 (receiving repairs and newly fitted with (i) Beyer Peacock Works Plate dated 1902 but without works number, and (ii) Plate indicating W & L No. 1.), 823, 1013, 1619, 5774, 6342, 8498, 9017, 46512. SLS/196106
08/04/1962 Oswestry Works 823, 1438, 3213, 3789, 7413, 7819, 46520. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1902 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 823
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 823    

prev