Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D125 |
31/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45071 |
12/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
31/10/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
12/07/1981 off Toton (TO) |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
07/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 02/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/05/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D125 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45071 |
|
|
31/12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45071 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|