Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 485 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19396 Week
» 84350 Month
» 287014 Year
» 3313867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
643 |
m/e |
11/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
5297 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
25297 |
m/e |
12/1936 |
British Railways |
58010 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
11/1904 |
SIROCCO |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
Precursor |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4452 |
To Service |
During 11/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1949 |
Service Life |
44 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1904 |
5A |
|
Crewe North |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7B |
Bangor |
4w/e |
30/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1915 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
03/1915 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1947 |
North Wales |
There are signs that North Wales is not the hunting ground it was during the war years for those seeking ex-L.N.W. locos.-particularly on passenger work. The Afon Wen line is now in the hands of 2-6-4 tanks on all passenger turns, and the new 2-6-2 tanks (Nos. 1200/1) work the Amlwch branch (goods and passenger), though there is still one roster for an ex-L.N.W. 2-4-2 tank. The Bettws-y-Coed-Blaenau Festiniog line has 2-6-2 tanks on passenger turns but L.N.W. 'Cauliflowers' work the goods turns. Bethesda branch passenger service is 'motor' fitted and worked by an ex-L.N.W. 'Coal Tank, which also does two trips to Carnarvon and back daily; an ex-L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' works the branch goods and sometimes has to have the branch 'Coal Tank' to assist it. The Chester-Denbigh, Rhyl-Denbigh and Denbigh-Corwen branches still have a considerable number of passenger turns for ex-L.N.W. locos.; in fact, the Denbigh ex-L.N.W. 2-4-2 tanks seem to work the hardest in all North Wales. The one time L. and Y. 0-6-0 at Denbigh for goods work has been replaced by Midland Class 3 0-6-0 No. 3396, while the Red Wharf Bay branch has a thrice weekly goods turn (M.W. and F.) worked by a L. and Y. 0-6-0 from Bangor. 'Lanky' 0-6-0's have replaced all the old L.N.W. 'Coal' engines at Bangor. Holywell Town branch is worked by a 'motor' fitted ex-L.N.W. 'Coal' tank which returns to Rhyl each night. Mold Junction shed has all the L.N.W. 0-8-0's now required for goods turns in North Wales-it seems strange for Llandudno Junc. to have none of this class. Indeed, except for pilot work and the Blaenau goods, the latter shed seems to have no regular rosters for ex-L.N.W. locos. Bangor is the possessor of most ex-L.N.W. locos. and includes 2-4-2T's, 0-6-2T's ('Coal' and 'Radial') and 0-6-0's, and the last 'Precursor' No. 25297, which is usually employed on the night milk train to Liverpool. With the introduction of more 2-6-4T and 2-6-2T into North Wales, the few ex-L.N.W. passenger 'Links' will soon disappear, and goods and pilot work will be the only jobs left. |
SLS/194709 |
11/06/1949 |
The last ex L. & N.W.R. passenger tender locomotive withdrawn |
The withdrawal of 'Precursor' Class 4-4-0 No. 25297 Sirocco during W/E 11/6/49 has rendered the passenger tender locomotives of the former L. & N.W.R. extinct. The two other recent survivors, 'Prince of Wales' Class No. 25752 and 'Claughton' Class No. 6004 were withdrawn during W/E 7/5/49 and 23/4/49 respectively. No. 25297 ran 1,496,387 miles during her working career; No. 6004 893,534 miles and No. 25752 855,602 miles. All three are to be broken up. |
SLS/194908 |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works (Scrap Road) |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 643, name: SIROCCO Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4452 |
|
|
03/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
03/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5297 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
12/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25297 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 58010 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25297 |
|
|
10/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|