Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1137 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14543 Week
» 67559 Month
» 187086 Year
» 3213939 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D13 |
05/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45001 |
28/04/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
05/11/1960 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
20/01/1986 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
24/11/1988 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/06/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
20/12/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
07/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
24/02/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D13 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
01/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
28/04/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45001 |
|
|
20/01/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45001 |
|
|
24/11/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|