Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1071 m/e 05/1897
LNER (1924) 4071 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 2116 m/e 08/1946
BR 62116 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class D3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D405/1897
D312/1917
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 201
Works Number 723
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 05/1897
Withdrawal During 10/1948
Service Life 51 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC BOS Boston 08/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick 14/09/1947
WDN CLK Colwick 16/10/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1897 To Service To service as GNR Number 1071
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 723
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4071    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2116    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
10/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2116    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62116 but not taken up    

prev prev