Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1348 m/e 12/1898
LNER (1924) 4348 m/e 04/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 2140 m/e 09/1946
BR 62140 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class D3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D412/1898
D305/1915
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 213
Works Number 809
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal During 06/1950 off Colwick (38A)
Scrapping During 10/1949
Service Life 51 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick m/e 06/05/1950
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick 11/08/1947
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 23/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as GNR Number 1348
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 809
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4348    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2140    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62140 but not taken up    
06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 2140 from Colwick (38A)    

prev prev