Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 898 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1798 Week
» 13619 Month
» 182391 Year
» 1066772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1359 m/e 12/1899
LNER (1924) 4359 m/e 01/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 2148 m/e 07/1946
BR 62148 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class D3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D412/1899
D311/1912
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 219
Works Number 870
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal During 11/1950
Service Life 50 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hitchin (GNR) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 24/09/1949
WDN   20/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service To service as GNR Number 1359
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 870
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4359    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2148    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hitchin (GNR) (HIT )    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62148 but not taken up    
11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 2148    

prev prev